This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 08:09:30 (UTC).

Rios v. Martin

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Rios filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cesar Rios

Sayre, OK 73662

Respondents

State of Oklahoma

Jimmy Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Sheri Marie Johnson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (OKC 313)

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

7 #10

Exhibit 10 - Relevant Transcript Pages

7 #8

Exhibit 8 - Amended Information

7 #7

Exhibit 7 - Summary Opinion

7 #6

Exhibit 6 - Motion to Witdraw Guilty Plea

7 #5

Exhibit 5 - Petition for Writ of Cert.

7 #4

Exhibit 4 - Minute Order

7 #3

Exhibit 3 - Motion to Witdraw Guilty Plea

7 #2

Exhibit 2 - Plea of Guilty

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - J&S

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Jimmy Martin ; (With attachments) (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 4/8/2019, Replies due by 5/8/2019); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Jimmy Martin (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sheri Marie Johnson on behalf of Jimmy Martin [Note: Attorney Sheri Marie Johnson added to party Jimmy Martin(pty:res).] (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Clerk of Court shall note the substitution of Jimmy Martin in place of the State of Oklahoma as party respondent. The Clerk of Court shall send, electronically, the petition (Dkt. # 1) and this order to the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov. Within thirty (30) days of the entry of this order, respondent shall file an answer to the petition, in accordance with Rule 5, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Extensions of time will be granted for good cause only. Petitioner may file a reply brief within thirty (30) days after the filing of respondent's answer., adding party Jimmy Martin terminating party State of Oklahoma, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition( Responses due by 3/8/2019, Replies due by 4/8/2019) (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING FEES Paid in Full by Cesar Rios (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Cesar Rios (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COPIES OF STATE COURT HABEAS TRANSCRIPT(S)/RECORD(S) by Jimmy Martin (With attachments) (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Jimmy Martin ; (With attachments) (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 4/8/2019, Replies due by 5/8/2019); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Jimmy Martin (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sheri Marie Johnson on behalf of Jimmy Martin [Note: Attorney Sheri Marie Johnson added to party Jimmy Martin(pty:res).] (Johnson, Sheri) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Remark: Emailed docket numbers 1 and 3 to the Office of the Attorney General at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 , #3 Order,,,,, Adding/Terminating Party(ies),,,,, Directing Respondent to Show Cause re: PWHC,,,,,,,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Clerk of Court shall note the substitution of Jimmy Martin in place of the State of Oklahoma as party respondent. The Clerk of Court shall send, electronically, the petition (Dkt. # 1) and this order to the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov. Within thirty (30) days of the entry of this order, respondent shall file an answer to the petition, in accordance with Rule 5, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Extensions of time will be granted for good cause only. Petitioner may file a reply brief within thirty (30) days after the filing of respondent's answer., adding party Jimmy Martin terminating party State of Oklahoma, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition( Responses due by 3/8/2019, Replies due by 4/8/2019) (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING FEES Paid in Full by Cesar Rios (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Cesar Rios (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheri M. Johnson