This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:10:50 (UTC).

Rios v. Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Rios filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melisa Rios

Defendant

Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernesto Sanchez

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Un Kei Wu

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Arlo Garcia Uriarte

Attorney at Liberation Law Group

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Daniel P. Iannitelli

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Jonathan S. Rebong

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Worthington Forgie

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John Frederick Baum

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/13/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE ARBITRATION, by Judge Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Baum, John) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC.. (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to re view General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marriott International, Inc., Other Affiliate RC Marriott, Inc., Other Affiliate RC Marriott III, Inc., Other Affiliate Marriott International Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Marriott Senior Holding Co., Other Affiliate MI Holding L.P., Other Affiliate RC Marriott II, Inc. for Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration of Angela O'Davies

1 #2

Declaration of John F. Baum

1 #1

Declaration of Kimberly Farr

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-574084. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13253380). Filed byRitz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Farr, #2 Declaration of John F. Baum, #3 Declaration of Angela O'Davies, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baum, John) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/13/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RE ARBITRATION, by Judge Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Baum, John) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • (#8) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC.. (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to re view General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Removed Complaint (See Document #1 -2; page 72) filed by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marriott International, Inc., Other Affiliate RC Marriott, Inc., Other Affiliate RC Marriott III, Inc., Other Affiliate Marriott International Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Marriott Senior Holding Co., Other Affiliate MI Holding L.P., Other Affiliate RC Marriott II, Inc. for Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Forgie, Ian) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-574084. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13253380). Filed byRitz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Farr, #2 Declaration of John F. Baum, #3 Declaration of Angela O'Davies, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baum, John) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less