This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 13:18:21 (UTC).

Rios-Rodriguez v. Department of Justice - Commonwealth of P.R. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Rios-Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Justice - Commonwealth of P R. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01291

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez

Defendants

Ignacio Morales-Gomez

Department of Justice - Commonwealth of P.R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ramos-Pagan

Attorney at Urb. El Valle

372 Calle Yagrumo

Caguas, PR 00727-3234

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel David Ramos-Pagan, Esq. appointed to represent Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez (Pro-se) re D.E. #10 Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2021. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez & Counsel: David Ramos-Pagan. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice in Spanish). (mg) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Granting #10 Motion to Restrict Document. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/16/2021. (MES) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Valerie M. Blay-Soler terminated. The Clerk of Court shall appoint new pro bono counsel. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/16/2021. (MES) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez Responses due by 7/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Valerie M. Blay-Soler filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez Responses due by 7/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Noting #7 Informative Motion. The undersigned at this time has no grounds to disqualify himself from presiding over the case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/29/2021. (MES) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Valerie M. Blay-Soler, Esq. appointed to represent Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez (Pro-se) re: Dkt. 5 ORDER. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2021. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez & Counsel: Valerie M. Blay-Soler, Esq. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice in Spanish). (mg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INFORMATIVE Letter filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 7/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (mg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Pursuant to the Order of the presiding District Judge at Docket No. 4 and in the interest of justice, a pro-bono appointment for plaintiff Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez is deemed appropriate. Title 18, United States Code, Section 1915 (e)(1). Pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 1915 (e) and Local Civil Rule 83L, the Clerk of the Court should appoint pro-bono counsel for Plaintiff Rios-Rodriguez. Counsel to be appointed shall have experience in civil rights cases. Upon pro-bono counsel's appearance, a reasonable time may be requested to amend the Complaint, if warranted. The Clerk's Office is to notify this Order by mail to Plaintiff Rios-Rodriguez at his address of record. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 06/24/2021.(cvr) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez Rive for appointment of pro bono counsel. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez Rive for appointment for pro bono counsel for Defendant, if eligible. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/23/2021.(MET) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/23/2021. (MET) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 7/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Department of Justice - Commonwealth of P.R., Ignacio Morales-Gomez, filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Service due by 9/15/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet).(mg) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie M. Blay-Soler