This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 11:08:43 (UTC).

Rios-Gonzalez v. Voris

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Rios-Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Voris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01475

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Rios-Gonzalez, Jr.

Defendant

Michael Seth Voris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey J. Tom

Jacob Douglas Cukjati

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Guerra

Celia Guerra

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE--The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to close this case upon entry of this Order. If the parties wish to reopen this case, they may do so by filing a motion to reopen. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS-- The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Wednesday, March 24, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Michael Seth Voris and Carlos Rios-Gonzalez Jr. Regarding Settlement. (Guerra, Celia) Modified on 2/25/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Scheduling Order by Michael Seth Voris and Carlos Rios-Gonzalez, Jr. (Guerra, Celia) Modified on 2/12/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Michael Seth Voris. (Guerra, Celia) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties are to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Seth Voris Notice of Removal (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14330267), filed by Michael Seth Voris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Guerra, Celia) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less