This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:35:23 (UTC).

Rio Grande Foundation et al v. Toulouse Oliver

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Rio Grande Foundation filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Toulouse Oliver. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01174

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Illinois Opportunity Project

Rio Grande Foundation

Defendant

Maggie Toulouse Oliver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colin Lambert Hunter

Attorney at Barnett Law Firm, P.A.

1905 Wyoming Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87112

Jeffrey M Schwab

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

Daniel R Suhr

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas M Sydow

Attorney at New Mexico Attorney General

201 Third St. Nw, Suite 300

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaars AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/13/2020. JSR due 2/11/2020. (smd) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M Sydow on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Sydow, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Rio Grande Foundation.(Sydow, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Rio Grande Foundation CERTIFICATE OF GOODSTANDING (Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rio Grande Foundation identifying Corporate Parent Rio Grande Foundation for Rio Grande Foundation. (Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Civil Rights Violations against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rio Grande Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020. (aek) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaars AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/13/2020. JSR due 2/11/2020. (smd) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M Sydow on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Sydow, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Rio Grande Foundation.(Sydow, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6858056 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6858040 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#6) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rio Grande Foundation by Colin Lambert Hunter on behalf of: Jeffrey M. Schwab Liberty Justice Center 190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500Chicago 3122637668 jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hunter, Colin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#5) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rio Grande Foundation by Colin Lambert Hunter on behalf of: Daniel R. Suhr Liberty Justice Center 190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500Chicago 3122637668 dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hunter, Colin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (arp) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6853371 re #1 Complaint filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Rio Grande Foundation CERTIFICATE OF GOODSTANDING (Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rio Grande Foundation identifying Corporate Parent Rio Grande Foundation for Rio Grande Foundation. (Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Civil Rights Violations against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rio Grande Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Mark Sydow