This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:26:34 (UTC).

RINGO v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 RINGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are HOPE T CANNON, ROGER VINSON, M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00525

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

HOPE T CANNON

GARY R JONES

Presiding Judges

ROGER VINSON

M CASEY RODGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD L NATIONS

Attorney at HOWARD L NATIONS PC - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042-3795

DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL R SANDERS - PENSACOLA FL

3298 Summit Blvd, Ste 32

Pensacola, FL 32503

PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

SARAH A LONG

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (SANDERS, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Added attorney SARAH A LONG, JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, and BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/3/2019. (djb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

17 #1

April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (Attachments: #1 April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby) (KIRBY, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON, MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv525-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

15 #1

April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD L NATIONS on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (Attachments: #1 April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations) (NATIONS, HOWARD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#12

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#27

(#18) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/29/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 12/28/2018)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 12/28/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (SANDERS, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Added attorney SARAH A LONG, JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, and BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/3/2019. (djb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (Attachments: #1 April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby) (KIRBY, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON, MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv525-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD L NATIONS on behalf of TAMMY VASQUEZ RINGO (Attachments: #1 April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations) (NATIONS, HOWARD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT FOR KEVIN M HODGES, DON K HAYCRAFT, CATHERINE PYUNE MCELDOWNEY and GEORGIA L LUCIER. (Mailed to Counsel). (MB) Modified on 4/1/2019 (MB). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for HOWARD L NATIONS for Plaintiff. (Mailed to Counsel). (MB) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for HOWARD L NATIONS re Plaintiff. (Mailed to Counsel). (MB) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-11716. Original file electronically transferred and docket entries #1 to #6 received. Modified on 4/1/2019 (MB). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/29/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7264601) filed by Tammy Vasquez Ringo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Tammy Vasquez Ringo(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/1/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less