This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 07:56:56 (UTC).

Ring v. Ted's Jumbo Red Hots, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Ring filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Ted's Jumbo Red Hots, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Skretny and John L. Sinatra, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William M. Skretny

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

 

Party Details

Appellant

John H. Ring, III

Appellee

Ted's Jumbo Red Hots, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

John Kennedy Rottaris

Attorney at Gross Shuman P.C.

465 Main Street, Suite 600

Buffalo, NY 14203

Kevin R. Lelonek

Attorney at Gross Shuman P.C.

465 Main Street, Suite 600

Buffalo, NY 14203

Appellee Attorneys

Catherine N. Eisenhut

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Jeffrey D. Coren

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Appendix

#5

4 #8

Bk. Doc. #167

4 #7

Bk. Doc. #164

4 #6

Bk. Doc. #130

4 #5

Bk. Doc. #84

4 #4

Bk. Doc. #73

4 #3

Bk. Doc. #70

4 #2

Bk. Doc. #66

4 #1

Bk. Doc. No. #176

#4

#2

1 #3

Doc. No. 164-Order

1 #2

Doc. No. 167-Notice of Appeal

1 #1

BK Docket Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appellant's BRIEF by John H. Ring, III. Appellee Brief due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lelonek, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Transmittal of Record on Appeal Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8010. (Attachments: #1 Bk. Doc. No. #176, #2 Bk. Doc. #66, #3 Bk. Doc. #70, #4 Bk. Doc. #73, #5 Bk. Doc. #84, #6 Bk. Doc. #130, #7 Bk. Doc. #164, #8 Bk. Doc. #167) (JLV) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. (JLV) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from further involvement in this matter and ask the Clerk of the Court to reassign this matter to another district judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/25/2021. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (JLV) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-11951CLB. File received, filed by John H. Ring, III. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet, #2 Doc. No. 167-Notice of Appeal, #3 Doc. No. 164-Order) (JLV) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less