This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:34:32 (UTC).

Rinderknecht v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Rinderknecht filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam E Haddon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Rinderknecht

Defendants

John Does 1-10

DePuy Inc.

DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson International

Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maxwell E. Kirchhoff

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Domenic A. Cossi

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant Attorney

Maxon R. Davis

Attorney at DAVIS HATLEY HAFFEMAN & TIGHE

Po Box 2103, 101 River Drive North The Milwaukee Station, Third Floor

Great Falls, MT 59401-2103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District consisting of Notice of Removal and state court pleadings from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Receipt of Filing with MDL (Notice of Related Actions filed on 5/20/19). (NOS) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lee Rinderknecht. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

2 #1

Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal). Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A, filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred from Montana has been opened in the Northern District of Texas as case 3:19-cv-01289, filed on 5/30/19. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Texas Northern. Copy of transfer order sent. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District consisting of Notice of Removal and state court pleadings from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Receipt of Filing with MDL (Notice of Related Actions filed on 5/20/19). (NOS) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lee Rinderknecht. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal). Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2305626. (NOS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A, filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less