This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:16:21 (UTC).

Riley v. United States Bankruptcy Court et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Riley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Bankruptcy Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00409

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Riley

Defendants

United States Bankruptcy Court

Hon. David R. Duncan

Bruce M. Rose

Joyce S. Goodwin

William Ryan Hovis

Linda K. Barr

Chris Ballinger

John Timothy Stack

Stone Law Firm

Daniel A. Stone

Fabricio Cardoso Santos

Martha Fleming

Fleming & Whitt P.A.

Pearce W. Fleming

D. Randolph Whitt

Eddye L. Lane, P.A.

Eddye L. Lane

Brian L. Boger Law Firm

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

12 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Riley. (lbak) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/15/2022. (lbak) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit C Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services E

8 #2

Exhibit D Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services

8 #3

Exhibit E Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Sch

8 #4

Exhibit F Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Sch

8 #5

Exhibit G Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit C Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services S

9 #2

Exhibit D Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services S

9 #3

Exhibit E Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services S

9 #4

Exhibit F Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Sche

9 #5

Exhibit G Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services E

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EMERGENCY MOTION for Recusal by Charles Riley. Response to Motion due by 4/13/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Section I, #2 Exhibit D Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Section I, #3 Exhibit E Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Section I, #4 Exhibit F Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Schedule for Meritech, #5 Exhibit G Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Exhibit C)No proposed order.(ahil, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation by Charles Riley. Reply to Objections due by 4/13/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Exhibit A Section I, #2 Exhibit D Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Exhibit A Section II, #3 Exhibit E Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Schedule for Meritech, #4 Exhibit F Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Fees for Services Schedule for Meritech, #5 Exhibit G Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions Network Schedule of Services Exhibit C)(ahil, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 4 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 6 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Charles Riley, P.O. Box 1353, Columbia, SC 29202-1353. (lbak) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Sherri A. Lydon. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: P. O. Box 23174 (29503), 401 West Evans Street, Florence, SC 29501. (lbak) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/15/2022. (lbak) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/15/2022. (lbak) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Charles Riley. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Riley. (lbak) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less