This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2020 at 09:39:45 (UTC).

Riley v. Turlock Irrigation District et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Riley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Turlock Irrigation District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01028

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erin Riley

Defendants

Monique Hampton

Turlock Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda J. Heitlinger

Defendant Attorneys

Nancy Elizabeth Harris

Edward L. Kreisberg

 

Court Documents

#5

#9

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Proposed Order Extending Due Date for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading

#4

3 #4

VDRP

3 #3

Consent Form

3 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER by Monique Hampton, Turlock Irrigation District.(Harris, Nancy) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Monique Hampton served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Heitlinger, Amanda) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Harris, Nancy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Harris, Nancy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER EXTENDING Due Date for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/20/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Due Date for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint by Monique Hampton, Turlock Irrigation District. Attorney Kreisberg, Edward L. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Due Date for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading)(Kreisberg, Edward) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monique Hampton, Turlock Irrigation District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda J. Heitlinger* *Arata Swingle Van Egmond & Goodwin* *1207 I Street* *Modesto, CA 95354*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Erin Riley. Attorney Heitlinger, Amanda J. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9015788) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heitlinger, Amanda) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less