This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:53:05 (UTC).

Riley v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Riley filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eleanor Riley

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Troy A. Brenes

Attorney at Brenes Law Group, P.C.

Suite 330, 100 Spectrum Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Adam M. Evans

Attorney at Dickerson Oxton, LLC

1200 Main St, Suite 2120

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorney

G. Brian Jackson

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP -TN

Suite 1600, 150 3Rd Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/13/21. (ddm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Evans on behalf of Eleanor Riley (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Brenes on behalf of Eleanor Riley (Brenes, Troy) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Brenes on behalf of Eleanor Riley (Brenes, Troy) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Evans on behalf of Eleanor Riley (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/13/21. (ddm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Eleanor Riley. (Direct file MDL) (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11657853) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. Brian Jackson