This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:50:26 (UTC).

Riley et al v. Dasmen Residential Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Riley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dasmen Residential Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo, Dana Douglas and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14636

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judges

Jane Triche Milazzo

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathy Harris

Ashley Brown

Angela L Woodson

Andrea Riley

Dakota Blunt

Defendants

Eastlake Development, LLC

Wilshire Insurance Company

KFK Group, Inc.

Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.

Dasmen Residential Management, LLC

RH Eastlake, LLC

KFK Development, LLC

Lynd Property Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett

Attorney at Jarrett Law Group

643 Magazine Street, Suite 301A

New Orleans, LA 70130

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Cassie E. Preston

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan M. Walsh

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Andrew J Brien

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

David F. Waguespack

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

David Scotton

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux,

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Victoria J. Cvitanovic

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice (1450 Poydras)

1450 Poydras Street, Suite 900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tabitha Robertson Durbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Jennifer E. Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Lashon Bell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Nicholas Stephen Bergeron

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Tucker Tyler Bohren

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Michael Edward Hill

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Counsel: ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel show cause, if any, why the matters listed on this Order should not be consolidated. Such submissions shall be made in writing and filed only in the record of the first case listed in the caption of the Order. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/6/2020.(ko) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jonathan M. Walsh, Cassie E. Preston, Victoria J. Cvitanovic for Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc. Attorney David F. Waguespack; Andrew J Brien and David Scotton terminated. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/22/2020. (clw) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party Eastlake Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Group, Inc.(pty:dft).(Preston, Cassie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc..Attorney Troy Lashon Bell added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bell, Troy) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Wilshire Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/30/2019.(am) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice of Compliance.**Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 5. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #1 Notice of removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas) Modified text/linkage on 12/30/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition) as to Dasmen Residential Management and RH Eastlake, LLC; answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/20/19. (ecm) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition) as to Wilshire Insurance Company answer due 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/20/19. (ecm) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohren, Tucker) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. By the Clerk.(am) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-12035 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8024756) filed by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Eastlake, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFK Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant