This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 07:15:11 (UTC).

Rigney et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Rigney filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00342

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Rigney

Danielle Hall

Tracy Kilburn

Michelle Feliciano

Kayla Celene Brake

Carrie Jazmin Brake

Kendra Skylar Brake

Cameron Levester Guy

Quentin Isaiah Brake

Peggy Betty

Dorothy May Handling

Joseph Prasnikar

Thomas Sanders

Kimberly Kee

Tiffany Renae Bryant

Shane Keith Bryant

Defendants

CSX Transportation, Inc.

James Hughey

Sherry Hughey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Eldridge Mills

Attorney at Reynolds, Potter, Ragan & Vandivort, PLC

210 E College Street

Dickson, TN 37055

C. Richard Newsome

Frank V. Cesarone

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Foote, Meyers, Mielke & Flowers, LLC

3 N Second Street, Suite 300

St. Charles, IL 60174

Timothy V. Potter

Attorney at Reynolds, Potter, Ragan & Vandivort, PLC

210 E College Street

Dickson, TN 37055

Defendant Attorneys

John J. Bennett

Attorney at Reifers Holmes & Peters LLC

80 Monroe Ave, Suite 410

Memphis, TN 38017

S. Camille Reifers

Cory Richard Miller

Attorney at Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain, PLLC

545 Mainstream Drive, Suite 101

Nashville, TN 37228

Parks T. Chastain

Attorney at Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain, PLLC

545 Mainstream Drive, Suite 101

Nashville, TN 37228

 

Court Documents

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A State Circuit Court file

4 #2

Exhibit B DeBoer Declaration

4 #3

Exhibit B-1 Stracnet Lines

#1

(#1) MOTION to Dismiss by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. . (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#3

(#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 6/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Richard Newsome: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/2/2022. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL S. Camille Reifers: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 6/2/2022. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFL State Bar status verified as active for C. Richard Newsome not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for S. Camille Reifers not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy V. Potter, Andrew Eldridge Mills, John J. Bennett, Parks T. Chastain, and Cory Richard Miller admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 6/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. . (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Dismiss by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Bennett, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSX Transportation, Inc. from Humphreys County Circuit Court, case number 10474. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3592466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Circuit Court file, #2 Exhibit B DeBoer Declaration, #3 Exhibit B-1 Stracnet Lines)(kc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cory Richard Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Camille Reifers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parks T Chastain