This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 08:04:58 (UTC).

Rigmaiden et al v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Rigmaiden filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Property Casualty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01212

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sean Rigmaiden

Rebecca Rigmaiden

Defendant

United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catharine Biggs

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Andrea Faye Butler

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher K Jones

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified docket text on 6/30/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

7 #1

Proposed order

#7

(#7) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party United Property & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rigmaiden, Rebecca Rigmaiden. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

4 #2

Certificate of good standing

4 #1

Proposed order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4702324) by Rebecca Rigmaiden, Sean Rigmaiden. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4664889) filed by Sean Rigmaiden, Rebecca Rigmaiden. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Rebecca Rigmaiden(pty:pla), Sean Rigmaiden(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) Modified on 5/7/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 7/6/2021. Signed by Judge James D. Cain, Jr. on 6/30/2021. (crt,Fontenot, S) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified docket text on 6/30/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party United Property & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rigmaiden, Rebecca Rigmaiden. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER Add Attorney Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Rigmaiden and Sean Rigmaiden.. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/11/2021. (crt,Petrofes, T) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/11/2021. (crt,Petrofes, T) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4702324) by Rebecca Rigmaiden, Sean Rigmaiden. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4664889) filed by Sean Rigmaiden, Rebecca Rigmaiden. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Rebecca Rigmaiden(pty:pla), Sean Rigmaiden(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) Modified on 5/7/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole