This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2020 at 09:28:20 (UTC).

Riggs v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Riggs filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00542

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taneisha W Riggs

Defendants

John Godish

Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

Government Employers Insurance Company

United Financial Casualty Company

Rasier, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katrina Deon Jackson

Attorney at Griffen Law Firm, L.L.C.

603 Europe Street, 70802

Baton Rouge, LA 70802-6410

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Todd Musgrave

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112-1812

Samuel Furman

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1515 Poydras Street Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112

Amanda Huling Aucoin

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112-1812

 

Court Documents

6 #4

Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

6 #3

Exhibit Unsworn Declaration of John Godish

6 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Petition

6 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Attachment Consent to Filing Removal

1 #6

Attachment Verification

1 #5

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended NOTICE of Removal by John Godish, United Financial Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Unsworn Declaration of John Godish, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 9/30/2020 to edit text.(EDC). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before October 8, 2020, the removing defendants shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Rasier, LLC by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/24/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by John Godish.(Musgrave, Richard) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (SGO) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by United Financial Casualty Company.(Musgrave, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 695863. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2159086), filed by John Godish, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Attachment Verification, #7 Attachment Consent to Filing Removal)(Musgrave, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant