This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2021 at 08:05:36 (UTC).

Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Cengage Learning, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cengage Learning, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10778

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Cengage Learning, Inc.

200 Pier 4 Boulevard, Suite 400

Boston, MA 02210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michaela M. Weaver

Attorney at KJC Law Firm, LLC

10 Tremont Street, 5Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

John T. Martin

Attorney at KJC Law Firm

10 Tremont Street, 6Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Letters of Good Standing

7 #1

Affidavit of William P. Ramey, III in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William P. Ramey, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8785669 by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William P. Ramey, III in Support, #2 Letters of Good Standing)(Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Martin on behalf of Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC (Martin, John) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Cengage Learning, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela M. Weaver on behalf of Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC (Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

1 #3

Civil Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cengage Learning, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8771113 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added William P. Ramey, III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William P. Ramey, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8785669 by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William P. Ramey, III in Support, #2 Letters of Good Standing)(Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Martin on behalf of Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC (Martin, John) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Cengage Learning, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela M. Weaver on behalf of Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC (Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cengage Learning, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8771113 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Weaver, Michaela) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cengage Learning, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michaela M. Weaver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T. Martin