Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:46:13 (UTC).

Riggins v. Morris et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Riggins filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Morris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daryl DeWayne Riggins

Wrightsville, GA 31096

Defendants

FNU Brown

Antoine G. Caldwell

Tarra Jackson

Kochelle Watson

Mitzi Hall

Edginald Gibbons

Susan Oliver

Chabara Davis Bragg

Lakisha Franklin

FNU Lomami

DeAnn Morris

FNU Lindsey

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER directing service of #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2020. (maa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#8

(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED, this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2020. (maa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

7 #1

Corrected Main Document

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daryl DeWayne Riggins.(maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (maa). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Compliance. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a complete amended complaint on the standard complaint form used by incarcerated litigants in the Southern District of Georgia, and include all matters he wishes the Court to consider in that one document within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/23/2020. (maa) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Compliance by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

2 #1

Form AO 240

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 240)(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER directing service of #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2020. (maa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED, this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2020. (maa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daryl DeWayne Riggins.(maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (maa). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/7/2020. (maa) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Compliance. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a complete amended complaint on the standard complaint form used by incarcerated litigants in the Southern District of Georgia, and include all matters he wishes the Court to consider in that one document within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/23/2020. (maa) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Inmate Account Statement by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. (pts) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Compliance by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 240)(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daryl DeWayne Riggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(pts) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less