This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 09:41:37 (UTC).

Riggins v. Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Riggins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Riggins

Defendant

Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. David Jordan

401 Evergreen Avenue

Brewton, AL 36426

Warner O. Hornsby

Attorney at Beasley Allen

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Defendant Attorneys

Charles J. Potts

Attorney at Briskman & Binion, P.C.

P. O. Box 43

Mobile, AL 36601

Mack B. Binion

Attorney at Briskman & Binion, P.C.

P. O. Box 43

Mobile, AL 36601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Consent to Mag

#3

(#3) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Order re: #3 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Clerk will provide call-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/01/2021. (srd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Standing Pretrial Order

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing Notice of Intent to File Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing Notice of Intent to File Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2022 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Jury Selection set for 11/1/2022 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Discovery cutoff 6/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2022. Motions due by 6/30/2022. Pre-Settlement Conference set for 6/7/2022 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Joint Proposed Protective Order due by 12/28/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/13/21. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (cmj) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2021. Rule 16 scheduling order to follow.DCR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order re: #3 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Clerk will provide call-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/01/2021. (srd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/6/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/20/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2891273, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Georgia-Pacific Brewton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Binion, Mack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles J. Potts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mack B. Binion