This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:24:51 (UTC).

Riggin v. Bolduc Aviation et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Riggin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bolduc Aviation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04064

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morris Riggin doing business as Riggin Flight Service

Defendants

Bolduc Aviation

Kevin Dunrud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob D. Dawson

Defendant Attorneys

Justin T. Clarke

Eric C. Schulte

Timothy R. Schupp

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit A - Horizon business records

6 #2

Exhibit B - 10-01-2014 letter to Riggin

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JUDGMENT in favor of Bolduc Aviation, Kevin Dunrud against Morris Riggin. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/28/19. (SRA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/28/19. (SRA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service by Bolduc Aviation, Kevin Dunrud (Clarke, Justin) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Kevin Todd Dunrud re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Horizon business records, #2 Exhibit B - 10-01-2014 letter to Riggin) (Clarke, Justin) Modified on 3/22/2019 (SLT). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bolduc Aviation, Kevin Dunrud. (Clarke, Justin) Modified on 3/22/2019 (SLT). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bolduc Aviation, Kevin Dunrud. (Clarke, Justin) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy R. Schupp for Bolduc Aviation and Kevin Dunrud. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/21/19. (mailed to Plaintiff attorney via USPS on 3/21)(JLS) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Attorney Timothy R. Schupp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3016646) by Bolduc Aviation, Kevin Dunrud. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3014515) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(SRA) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less