This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:35:31 (UTC).

Riggi v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Riggi filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann Riggi

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Miller

608 W. Oak Street, Po Box 201

Frackville, PA 17931

Fatima Abuzerr

Attorney at Moll Law Group

22 W Washington St, 15Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Brittany Rygiel

Attorney at Moll Law Group

22 W Washington St, Ste 15Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

9 #1

MJ Pltf Packet

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed by Ann Riggi.(Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for leave to file amended complaint See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/4/22 (ms) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

6 #2

Complaint with Strike Throughs

6 #1

Amended Complaint

#6

(#6) MOTION Leave to Amend re #1 Complaint by Ann Riggi. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint with Strike Throughs)(Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#5

(#5) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brittany Rygiel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/1/22. (ms) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/25/2022) (gs). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brittany Rygiel on behalf of Ann Riggi Attorney Brittany Rygiel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5830532.. (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Rygiel on behalf of Ann Riggi (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

2 #1

MJ Pltf Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5815102), filed by Ann Riggi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed by Ann Riggi.(Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for leave to file amended complaint See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/4/22 (ms) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION Leave to Amend re #1 Complaint by Ann Riggi. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint with Strike Throughs)(Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Atty. Brittany Rygiel is directed to file an amended page 3 of the Doc. 4 petition for special admission that will reflect the identifying information of associate counsel to be entered of record in the case (Atty Rygiel lists herself in this paragraph). (ms) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brittany Rygiel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/1/22. (ms) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/25/2022) (gs). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brittany Rygiel on behalf of Ann Riggi Attorney Brittany Rygiel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5830532.. (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketADMISSION FORMS SENT to Attorney Rygiel. (lg) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Rygiel on behalf of Ann Riggi (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Atty Fatima Abuzerr advised via telephone to apply for admission to Court and request ECF filing privileges through PACER; (ep) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5815102), filed by Ann Riggi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fatima Abuzerr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Miller(Designation Retained)