This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:25:40 (UTC).

Carol Riegert v. Central Billing, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Carol Riegert filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Central Billing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08959

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Riegert

Defendants

Central Billing, LLC dba Pacific Collection Group

Central Billing, LLC

Central Billing, LLC doing business as Pacific Collection Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas J Bontrager

Attorney at Martin and Bontrager APC

6464 West Sunset Boulevard Suite 960

Los Angeles, CA 90028

George Thomas Martin, III

Attorney at Martin and Bontrager APC

6464 West Sunset Boulevard Suite 960

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Tokar

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436-2581

David P Beitchman

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit Scheduling Grid

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Grid)(Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/14/2020. (ake) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC, (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC.(Attorney Paul Tokar added to party Central Billing, LLC (pty:dft))(Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert, upon Defendant Central Billing, LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08959 JAK(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Central Billing, LLC. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert, identifying None. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24623460 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Attorney Nicholas J Bontrager added to party Carol Riegert(pty:pla))(Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Grid)(Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/14/2020. (ake) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC, (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC.(Attorney Paul Tokar added to party Central Billing, LLC (pty:dft))(Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert, upon Defendant Central Billing, LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08959 JAK(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Central Billing, LLC. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert, identifying None. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24623460 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carol Riegert. (Attorney Nicholas J Bontrager added to party Carol Riegert(pty:pla))(Bontrager, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL BILLING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Tokar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P Beitchman