This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:18:09 (UTC).

Ridgeview IP LLC v. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Ridgeview IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vacant Judgeship (2022). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00558

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ridgeview IP LLC

Defendant

Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy A. Tigan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,983,270. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#7

(#7) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00557-VAC, 1:22-cv-00558-VAC, 1:22-cv-00559-VAC, 1:22-cv-00560-VAC, 1:22-cv-00561-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ridgeview IP LLC. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 27, 2022 - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/27/2022 - filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/27/2022 - filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. answer due 7/27/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/21/2022. (etg) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/27/2022 - filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 27, 2022 filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. -- Reset Answer Deadline: Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. answer due 6/27/2022. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/23/22. (ntl) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 27, 2022 - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ridgeview IP LLC. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00557-VAC, 1:22-cv-00558-VAC, 1:22-cv-00559-VAC, 1:22-cv-00560-VAC, 1:22-cv-00561-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 5/4/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00557-VAC, 1:22-cv-00558-VAC, 1:22-cv-00559-VAC, 1:22-cv-00560-VAC, 1:22-cv-00561-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00557-VAC, 1:22-cv-00558-VAC, 1:22-cv-00559-VAC, 1:22-cv-00560-VAC, 1:22-cv-00561-VAC (rjb) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,983,270. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3861838.) - filed by Ridgeview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy A. Tigan