This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2021 at 07:40:32 (UTC).

Ridgecrest Associates, L.P. v. Ingersoll-Rand, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Ridgecrest Associates, L P filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Ingersoll-Rand, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-06346

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ridgecrest Associates, L.P.

Defendants

Accudyne Industries, LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand U.S. HoldCo., Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dwight Eliot Kanyuck

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, Two State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Linda R. Shaw

Attorney at KNAUF SHAW LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Linda Radko Shaw

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, Two State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

5 #3

Waiver of Service, Ingersoll-Rand, Inc.

5 #2

Waiver of Services, Accudyne Industries, LLC

5 #1

Waiver of Service-Ingersoll-Rand US Holdco , Inc.

#5

#4

#3

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #7

Summons-Ingersoll-Rand U.S. HoldCo, Inc.

1 #6

Summons-Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.

1 #4

Summons-Accudyne

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1995 GZA Audit

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Accudyne Industries, LLC answer due 8/13/2021; Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. answer due 8/13/2021; Ingersoll-Rand U.S. HoldCo., Inc. answer due 8/13/2021; Ingersoll-Rand, Inc answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/21/21. (JHF) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Setting Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Ridgecrest Associates, L.P.. (Kanyuck, Dwight) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ridgecrest Associates, L.P.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service-Ingersoll-Rand US Holdco, Inc., #2 Waiver of Services, Accudyne Industries, LLC, #3 Waiver of Service, Ingersoll-Rand, Inc.)(Kanyuck, Dwight) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ridgecrest Associates, L.P.. (Kanyuck, Dwight) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Radko Shaw on behalf of Ridgecrest Associates, L.P. (Shaw, Linda) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Accudyne Industries, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc., Ingersoll-Rand U.S. HoldCo., Inc., Ingersoll-Rand, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4228675, filed by Ridgecrest Associates, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1995 GZA Audit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Completion, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons-Accudyne, #5 Summons-Ingersoll-Rand Inc., #6 Summons-Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc., #7 Summons-Ingersoll-Rand U.S. HoldCo, Inc.)(Kanyuck, Dwight) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGERSOLL-RAND INDUSTRIAL U.S., INC. is a litigant