This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 13:48:21 (UTC).

Rideout v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Rideout filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cymantha Rideout

Defendant

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew M. Grabhorn

Attorney at Grabhorn Law Office, PLLC

2525 Nelson Miller Parkway, Suite 107

Louisville, KY 40223

Michael D. Grabhorn

Attorney at Grabhorn Law Office, PLLC

2525 Nelson Miller Parkway, Suite 107

Louisville, KY 40223

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin E. Roberts

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Indianapolis

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Eric P. Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Valparaiso

56 S. Washington Street, Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/14/2020: Joint proposed scheduling order due by 8/18/2020. cc: counsel, KL (JM) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/13/20; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric P. Mathisen. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

8 #3

Proposed Order

8 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Declaration of Eric P. Mathisen

#8

(#8) MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3135917. by Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 6/22/20 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer : Defendant will haveup to and including 7/13/2020, to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order

#6

(#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3106959., filed by Cymantha Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/14/2020: Joint proposed scheduling order due by 8/18/2020. cc: counsel, KL (JM) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/13/20; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric P. Mathisen. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3135917. by Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 6/22/20 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer : Defendant will haveup to and including 7/13/2020, to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 5/22/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3106959., filed by Cymantha Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less