Ridenti v. Google LLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against All Defendants (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0101-8154408 - Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paula Ridenti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Vallely, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Ridenti. Google LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Vallely, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Ridenti. Youtube, LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Vallely, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien on behalf of Google LLC, Youtube, LLC (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Cooke on behalf of Google LLC, Youtube, LLC (Cooke, Adam) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edith Ramirez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8228513 by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Google LLC, Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Youtube, LLC; Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC.. (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint Motion to Enter Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edith Ramirez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #13 MOTION to Stay , #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California.. Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay filed by Paula Ridenti. (Vallely, Patrick) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Opposition re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. filed by Paula Ridenti. (Vallely, Patrick) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/4/2020) (Lima, Christine). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Patrick J. Vallely in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. filed by Paula Ridenti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vallely, Patrick) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC Notice of Intent to File Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of their Motion to Transfer (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #19 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. filed by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #13 Motion to Stay. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC Notice of Recent Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F Noonan on behalf of Google LLC, Youtube, LLC (Noonan, Gregory) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC of Recent Filings (Noonan, Gregory) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion to transfer (Docket No. #12 ) is ALLOWED. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. So ordered.(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#28) Case transferred Electronically to the District of Northern District of California. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts (Boston); Case Number 1:20-cv-10517-NMG. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC, YouTube LLC.. (Ramirez, Edith) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#32) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/15/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#34) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 13, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by July 6th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02313-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re #35 Order Relating and Consolidating Cases. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S. Gilliam no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketFor Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Action 5:19-cv-07016-BLF. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less