This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2022 at 06:13:41 (UTC).

Ridenour v. Nevada Bell Telephone Co., et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Ridenour filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Nevada Bell Telephone Co . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb (Recall), Miranda M. Du and Craig S. Denney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judges

William G. Cobb (Recall)

Craig S. Denney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Ridenour

Sparks, NV 89436

Defendants

Nevada Bell Telephone Co. doing business as AT&T Nevada

Communications Workers of America Union Local 9413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alison Lungstrum McNeill

1410 N. High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Alison Lungstrum Macneill

Attorney at Campbell Litigation, P.C.

1410 N. High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Elizabeth A Fletcher

Attorney at Fletcher & Lee

448 Ridge Street

Reno, NV 89501

Stacey A Campbell

Attorney at Campbell Litigation, P.C.

1410 N. High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Tiffany Lynn Crain Altamirano

Attorney at Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld

3199 E. Warm Springs Road, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89120

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Alison Lungstrum Macneill withdrawn from the case for Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/27/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

36 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw Alison Lungstrum Macneill as Attorne

36 #36

Main Document

#35

(#35) ORDER approving ECF No. #34 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Stacey A. Campbell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Elizabeth Fletcher. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#34

(#34) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stacey A. Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth Fletcher (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6854257) by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

33 #1

Certificate of Service Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss

33 #33

Main Document

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#29) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2022. ORDER granting #28 Motion to Extend Time; Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 5/1/2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit A-3: Docket Sheet in Case No. CV21-02073, Second Judicial District Cour

1 #3

Exhibit A-2: Complaint and Summons served on Defendant Nevada Bell

1 #2

Exhibit A-1: Complaint filed in the State Court Lawsuit

1 #1

Exhibit A: Declaration of Elizabeth Fletcher, Esq.

#1

(#8) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Alison Lungstrum Macneill withdrawn from the case for Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/27/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alison Lungstrum Macneill for Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw Alison Lungstrum Macneill as Attorney of Record) (Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER approving ECF No. #34 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Stacey A. Campbell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Elizabeth Fletcher. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stacey A. Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth Fletcher (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6854257) by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Communications Workers of America Union Local 9413. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss) (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY to Response to #24 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Macneill, Alison) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #24 ), by Plaintiff Steven Ridenour. Replies due by 3/29/2022. (DRM) Modified on 3/22/2022 to add hyperlink (DRM). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER - Defendants' joint motion to stay discovery pending resolution of the dispositive motions (ECF No. #25 ) is GRANTED. The proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order submitted by the parties (ECF No. #27 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The parties' shall submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 daysof any order denying the motion(s) to dismiss or any order granting the motion(s) to dismiss with leave to amend (i.e., if the motion(s) to dismiss are not completely dispositive of the case). Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2022. ORDER granting #28 Motion to Extend Time; Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 5/1/2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unoppposed MOTION to Extend Time 21 Days (First Request) to file Response to ECF No. #24 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Steven Ridenour. (DRM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Nevada Bell Telephone Co.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/7/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/22/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Petition for Removal. Attorney Tiffany L. Crain advised to review the docket sheet. Your address does not match with the address in CMECF. Please update your CMECF and file the necessary paperwork to be in compliance with LR IA 11-1(b). (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 1/19/2022 DISREGARD NOTICE #13 indicates a Nevada address. (WJ). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Alison Lungstrum MacNeill to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/20/2022. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (WJ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (Recall). (WJ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Joint PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Washoe, Case Number CV21-02073, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6752959) by COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA UNION LOCAL 9413, NEVADA BELL TELEPHONE CO. DBA AT&T NEVADA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Elizabeth Fletcher, Esq., #2 Exhibit A-1: Complaint filed in the State Court Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit A-2: Complaint and Summons served on Defendant Nevada Bell, #4 Exhibit A-3: Docket Sheet in Case No. CV21-02073, Second Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Washoe, printed 1/6/2022, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fletcher, Elizabeth) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nevada Bell Telephone Co. doing business as AT&T Nevada is a litigant

Latest cases where Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth A Fletcher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey A. Campbell