This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2022 at 22:41:16 (UTC).

Carlton Ridenhour v. Michael Closter et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Carlton Ridenhour filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Michael Closter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08824

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlton Ridenhour

Defendants

Reach Global, Inc.

Michael Closter

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert S Besser

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Christopher Wills Chapin

Attorney at Law Offices of Christopher Chapin

110 Forest Lane

San Rafael, CA 94930

Robert S. Besser

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Besser

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence Yale Iser

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Zachary Truman Elsea

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump and Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Gregory Philip Korn

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump and Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reach Global, Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020; Michael Closter answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Reach Global, Inc.; Michael Closter.(Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reach Global, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2020; Michael Closter answer now due 1/13/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Reach Global, Inc.; Michael Closter.(Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Michael Closter(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Reach Global, Inc.(pty:dft))(Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#17

#16

#15

#14

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reach Global, Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020; Michael Closter answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Reach Global, Inc.; Michael Closter.(Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reach Global, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2020; Michael Closter answer now due 1/13/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Reach Global, Inc.; Michael Closter.(Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Michael Closter(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Reach Global, Inc.(pty:dft))(Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. upon Michael Closter waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Gregory Korn. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reach Global, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael Closter. (jp) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88) #2 , Subpoena Request (AO 88) #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Summons Request. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88) #2 , Subpoena Request (AO 88) #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour, identifying Bring the Noize Music, Inc.. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24602591 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carlton Ridenhour. (Attorney Robert S Besser added to party Carlton Ridenhour(pty:pla))(Besser, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Wills Chapin Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Stephen Besser Esquire