This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

RIDDLE v. FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 RIDDLE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO - INDIANA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Evans Barker and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHIE RIDDLE

Defendant

FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John H. Haskin

Paul Anthony Logan

Defendant Attorneys

Blake J. Burgan

Kristine Anne Gordon

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff RICHIE RIDDLE. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff RICHIE RIDDLE. (Logan, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (DJH) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by RICHIE RIDDLE. FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA served on 1/18/2022. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Anne Gordon on behalf of Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Gordon, Kristine) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (RAGS) (CKM) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2022 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/3/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2022 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/3/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (RAGS) (CKM) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Anne Gordon on behalf of Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Gordon, Kristine) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Defendant FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by RICHIE RIDDLE. FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA served on 1/18/2022. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA. (DJH) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff RICHIE RIDDLE. (Logan, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff RICHIE RIDDLE. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against FERGUSON CONSTRUCTION CO. - INDIANA, filed by RICHIE RIDDLE. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6917993) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less