This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 10:06:19 (UTC).

Riddick v. Kegley et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Riddick filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kegley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glen E. Conrad and Pamela Meade Sargent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00562

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glen E. Conrad

Referral Judge

Pamela Meade Sargent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steve Riddick

Pound, VA 24279

Steven Riddick

Pound, VA 24279

Defendants

Larry Mullins

Warden Jeffery Kiser

Raeann Kegley

Shannon Fuller

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Steve Riddick (tvt)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying plaintiff's submission #6 filed by Steve Riddick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/26/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's notice of correct spelling of Defendant D. Still by Steven Riddick. (slt) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/7/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT to ADD- Shannon Fuller - Assistant Warden as a defendant, filed by Steve Riddick.(tvt)

#2

(#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

1 #2

Letter stating plaintiff wants to filed in forma pauperis

1 #1

List of Defendants

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Raeann Kegley, Jeffery Kiser, Larry Mullins, filed by Steve Riddick. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants #2 Letter stating plaintiff wants to file in forma pauperis) (tvt).

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Steve Riddick (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying plaintiff's submission #6 filed by Steve Riddick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/26/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's notice of correct spelling of Defendant D. Still by Steven Riddick. (slt) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/7/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Steve Riddick (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT to ADD- Shannon Fuller - Assistant Warden as a defendant, filed by Steve Riddick.(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Raeann Kegley, Jeffery Kiser, Larry Mullins, filed by Steve Riddick. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants #2 Letter stating plaintiff wants to file in forma pauperis) (tvt).

    Read MoreRead Less