This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 07:21:34 (UTC).

Riddick et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Riddick filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven E. Rau and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01461

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven E. Rau

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Millan

Alexander Gomez

David Lee

Miguel Quezads

Matthew Francis

Timothy Troiano

Adrian Gonzalez

Timothy Dixon

Deandre Johnson

Matthew Nelson

Brandon Clinkscale

Chad Hill

Terry Endicott

David Caracas

Marc Gonzalez

Alex Manns

Patrick Corso

Cesar Jimenez

Michael Lans

Jose Quintanar

77 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey D Marshall

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Lewis A Remele, Jr

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Ste 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Aram V. Desteian

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th St., Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brittany B Skemp

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Other Attorneys

Jerry W Blackwell

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

S Jamal Faleel

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Tarrin Riddick, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment

1 #4

Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service on Aero

1 #3

Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service on 3M

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-8359 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6915190) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases, #3 Affidavit of Service on 3M, #4 Affidavit of Service on Aero, #5 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment, #6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (kt) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (Text-only) ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Pursuant to the parties Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to MDL No. 2885, pending in the Northern District of Florida before the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/13/2019. (MME) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Tarrin Riddick, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1461 (SRN/SER). (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-8359 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6915190) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases, #3 Affidavit of Service on 3M, #4 Affidavit of Service on Aero, #5 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment, #6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faris Rashid

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry W Blackwell