Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 11:37:40 (UTC).

RICKS v. UNITED STATES RAILROAD RETIREMENT BOARD

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 RICKS filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES RAILROAD RETIREMENT BOARD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00799

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICKS

P.O. Box 1359

Suitland, MD 20752

Defendant

UNITED STATES RAILROAD RETIREMENT BOARD

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. (See order for details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/27/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/27/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by RICKS(Mrs., Spouse Beneficiary, Both Parties Aggrieved). (zsb) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICKS(Mrs., Spouse Beneficiary, Both Parties Aggrieved). (zsb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. (See order for details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/27/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/27/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by RICKS(Mrs., Spouse Beneficiary, Both Parties Aggrieved). (zsb) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICKS(Mrs., Spouse Beneficiary, Both Parties Aggrieved). (zsb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by RICKS(Mrs., Spouse Beneficiary, Both Parties Aggrieved). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zsb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/26/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICK is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant