This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2020 at 21:22:24 (UTC).

Richmond v. Fairfield Inn & Suites

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Richmond filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Fairfield Inn Suites. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01627

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Altamese E Richmond

Accokeek, MD 20607

Altamese Elizabeth Richmond

Accokeek, MD 20607

Defendants

Fairfield Inn & Suites

Marriott International, Inc.

44 Alexandria Associates, LLC

Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company

Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake Andrew Weiner

Attorney at The Law Firm of Blake A. Weiner, PLLC

1011 East Main Street, Suite 204

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Bethany Clair

Attorney at FordHarrison LLP

1300 19Th St Nw, Suite 420

Washington, DC 20036

Kenneth Maxwell Bernas

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC (DC)

2020 K St Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

Tina Marie Maiolo

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC (DC)

2020 K St Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#31

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company. (Maiolo, Tina) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 04/23/20. (pmil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Rodriguez and Certification of Local Counsel B. Patrice Clair Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7170976. by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P., Marriott International, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc..(Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re: #31 Answer to Complaint. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the document. (pmil, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company. (Bernas, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC. (Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC.(Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.. (Clair, Bethany) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons for Defendant Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons for Defendant Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons for Defendant 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International Inc., 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P., Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company, filed by Altamese E Richmond.(Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Andrew Weiner on behalf of Altamese E Richmond (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Fairfield Inn & Suites and given to USMS for Service. (rban, ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/30/2019. (rban, copy mailed ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Altamese E Richmond. (choy, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fairfield Inn & Suites (Filing fee $ 400 (not paid).), filed by Altamese E Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(choy, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERSHA HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bethany Clair