This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2023 at 09:08:46 (UTC).

Richman Technology Corporation v. Alarm.com Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 Richman Technology Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alarm com Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richman Technology Corporation

Defendant

Alarm.com Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8174378

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richman Technology Corporation. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richman Technology Corporation. Alarm.com Incorporated served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2023

DocketReset Deadlines: Alarm.com Incorporated answer due 2/8/2023. (lad) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 8, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lolc) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Richman Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Alarm.com Incorporated answer due 1/9/2023. (lad) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 9, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lolc) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Richman Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richman Technology Corporation. Alarm.com Incorporated served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richman Technology Corporation. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16745340), filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8174378, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less