This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 10:30:02 (UTC).

Richey v. FedEx Freight, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Richey filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FedEx Freight, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Richey

Defendant

FedEx Freight, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael F. McGuinness

Attorney at PATTEN PETERMAN BEKKEDAHL & GREEN, PLLC

2817 Second Ave North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Defendant Attorney

Oliver H. Goe

Attorney at BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN

800 N. Last Chance Gulch, Suite 101, Po Box 1697

Helena, MT 59624-1697

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#11

(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/18/2021. (JDH) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/22/2021. A telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on April 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/11/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court by FedEx Freight, Inc. (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against FedEx Freight, Inc. filed by Thomas Richey. (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

4 #2

Receipt

4 #1

State Court documents

#4

(#4) STATE COURT FILE: DV-21-0086, MT 13TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, YELLOWSTONE COUNTY. Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents, #2 Receipt) (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed via NEF to Counsel Oliver H. Goe, Michael F. McGuinness. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/15/2021. (NOS) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Freight, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-21-86., filed by FedEx Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/18/2021. (JDH) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/22/2021. A telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on April 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/11/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court by FedEx Freight, Inc. (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against FedEx Freight, Inc. filed by Thomas Richey. (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT FILE: DV-21-0086, MT 13TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, YELLOWSTONE COUNTY. Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents, #2 Receipt) (JEH) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed via NEF to Counsel Oliver H. Goe, Michael F. McGuinness. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/15/2021. (NOS) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2621601 (JDH) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Freight, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-21-86., filed by FedEx Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FedEx Freight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliver H. Goe