Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 08:26:25 (UTC).

Richardson v. Stanford Health Care

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Richardson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Stanford Health Care. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tacita Richardson

Defendant

Stanford Health Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher Bernard Brown

Attorney at Fletcher B. Brown Law Firm

2831 Telegraph Avenue

Oakland, CA 94609

Defendant Attorneys

Alyson Cabrera

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jessica Marie Peterson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael D. Bruno

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tacita Richardson.. (Brown, Fletcher) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanford Health Care.. (Cabrera, Alyson) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanford Health Care (Peterson, Jessica) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/ 2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 20CV364399. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15461784). Filed byStanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cabrera, Alyson) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tacita Richardson.. (Brown, Fletcher) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanford Health Care.. (Cabrera, Alyson) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE RR: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/23/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanford Health Care (Peterson, Jessica) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/ 2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE DISREGARD. ASSIGNED IN ERROR. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) Modified on 1/20/2021 (mbcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 20CV364399. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15461784). Filed byStanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cabrera, Alyson) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alyson Cabrera

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D Bruno