This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 08:56:25 (UTC).

RICHARDSON v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 RICHARDSON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Michael A. Shipp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00679

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDDIE RICHARDSON

Bridgeton, NJ 08302

Defendants

RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

JOHN DOES 1-10

NURSE ROE

M.D. SANDRA CONNOLLY

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Letter

1 #2

Application IFP

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Application IFP, #3 Envelope)(abr) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting the Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 ; this matter shall be reopened and the Complaint shall be filed; Summons shall not be issued at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed; the time to serve process under Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m) is extended to the date 90 days after the Court permits the Complaint to proceed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff, the Attorney General of the State of New Jersey and the administrator of South Woods State Prison. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/28/2020. (jem) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Administratively terminating this case; Further Ordering if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court in writing, with a completed IFP application or filing fee, within 30 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/23/2019. (jem) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification by FREDDIE RICHARDSON. (jem) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT filed; see docket entry #1 .(jem) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting the Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 ; this matter shall be reopened and the Complaint shall be filed; Summons shall not be issued at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed; the time to serve process under Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m) is extended to the date 90 days after the Court permits the Complaint to proceed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff, the Attorney General of the State of New Jersey and the administrator of South Woods State Prison. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/28/2020. (jem) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification by FREDDIE RICHARDSON. (jem) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Administratively terminating this case; Further Ordering if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court in writing, with a completed IFP application or filing fee, within 30 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/23/2019. (jem) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (jem) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Application IFP, #3 Envelope)(abr) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.