This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2022 at 07:02:41 (UTC).

Richardson v. Davis

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Richardson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth K. Dillon and Joel C. Hoppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Richardson

State Farm, VA 23160

Defendant

Davis

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.]

#4

(#4) TRANSFER ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/13/2022. Copies mailed 7/13/2022.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.]

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00281. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRANSFER ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/13/2022. Copies mailed 7/13/2022.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Richardson. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Davis (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Brian Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVIS(D) is a litigant