This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:28:30 (UTC).

Richards #641715 v. Washington et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Richards 641715 filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyle Brandon Richards #641715

Baraga, MI 49908-9204

Defendants

Don DeForge

Jpay Inc.

Heidi Washington

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet) (slk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#24

(#24) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#23

(#23) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#22

(#22) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (mailed last page of docket sheet) (slk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION for reconsideration re #12 by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (slk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#20

(#20) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

15 #1

Declaration of Larry Taylor #432739

#12

(#21) MOTION for reconsideration re #12 by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (slk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#8

(#8) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and an investigation (mailed docket sheet showing when documents were filed) (slk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6

(#6) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and a list of cases (mailed docket sheet and a list of cases) (slk) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle Brandon Richards (mlc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12106; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Magistrate Referral filed by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 against Don DeForge, Jpay Inc., Heidi Washington (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet) (slk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (mailed last page of docket sheet) (slk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for reconsideration re #12 by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (slk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 regarding documents that were filed #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 and Subpoena forms (mailed subpoena forms with the notice to plaintiff) (no motion for reconsideration was included in the envelope) (mlc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 re MOTION to appoint counsel #16 , MOTION to change venue MOTION to disqualify judge #17 , MOTION for order named as, "motion for protective order and request for federal investigation and monitoring" #15 (mlc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to change venue , MOTION to disqualify judge by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to clarify named as, "motion for clarification and request for federal investigation and monitoring" by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and an investigation (mailed docket sheet showing when documents were filed) (slk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and a list of cases (mailed docket sheet and a list of cases) (slk) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle Brandon Richards (mlc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12106; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Magistrate Referral filed by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 against Don DeForge, Jpay Inc., Heidi Washington (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less