This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2022 at 08:12:06 (UTC).

Richard v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Richard filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wright National Flood Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60326

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dolly Richard

Defendant

Wright National Flood Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole Elizabeth Garcia

Attorney at MAC Legal PA

4601 Sheridan Street, Suite 205

Hollywood, FL 33021

Kristen Diane Montgomery

Attorney at MAC Legal PA.

3100 N. 29Th Ave, 33020

Hollywood, FL 33063

Michael Abraham Citron

Attorney at MAC Legal, PA

3100 N. 29Th Court, Suite 100

Hollywood, FL 33020

Regine Soraya Lauren Etienne

Attorney at MAC Legal P.A.

4601 Sheridan Street, Suite 205

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Paul Stearns

Attorney at Freeborn & Peters LLP

201 North Franklin Street, Suite 3550

Tampa, FL 33602

Hoyt L. Prindle, III

Attorney at Freeborn , Peters LLP

201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 3550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Flood Dec Page

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER Requiring Removal Status Report and Joint Scheduling Report. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/25/2022, Removal Status Report due by 2/18/2022.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Flood Dec Page

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Wright National Flood Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dolly Richard. Replies due by 3/11/2022. (Etienne, Regine) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dolly Richard (Etienne, Regine) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Dolly Richard (Garcia, Nicole) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER of Dismissal re #12 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; Dismissing this Matter with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Dolly Richard (Garcia, Nicole) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Stipulation of Dismissal. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ls) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dolly Richard (Etienne, Regine) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Wright National Flood Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dolly Richard. Replies due by 3/11/2022. (Etienne, Regine) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report by Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit )(Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Wright National Flood Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Flood Dec Page)(Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Requiring Removal Status Report and Joint Scheduling Report. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/25/2022, Removal Status Report due by 2/18/2022.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint For Damages) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15394263, filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Flood Dec Page, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prindle, Hoyt) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoyt L. Prindle, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Paul Stearns