This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2020 at 07:43:58 (UTC).

Richard v. Jefferson Parish Public School Board

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 Richard filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Jefferson Parish Public School Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13544

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raychell Richard

Defendants

Jefferson Parish Public School Board

Jefferson Parish School Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Whitney Morgan Wilson

Attorney at Sangisetty Law Firm

3914 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

Ravi K. Sangisetty

Attorney at Sangisetty Law Firm

3914 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Michael George Fanning

Attorney at Grant & Barrow, APLC

238 Huey P. Long Ave., P. O. Box 484

Gretna, LA 70054

Brad James Gegenheimer

Attorney at Grant & Barrow, APLC

238 Huey P. Long Ave., P. O. Box 484

Gretna, LA 70054

Olden C. Toups, Jr.

Attorney at Grant & Barrow, APLC

238 Huey P. Long Ave., P. O. Box 484

Gretna, LA 70054

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jefferson Parish Public School Board (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7946897) filed by Raychell Richard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Whitney Morgan Wilson added to party Raychell Richard(pty:pla).(Wilson, Whitney) Modified on 11/13/2019 (clw). SERVICE WILL BE ACCOMPLISHED THROUGH WAIVER (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Parish Public School Board. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Olden C. Toups, Jr added to party Jefferson Parish Public School Board(pty:dft).(Toups, Olden) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jefferson Parish Public School Board on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Wilson, Whitney) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Parish Public School Board. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Olden C. Toups, Jr added to party Jefferson Parish Public School Board(pty:dft).(Toups, Olden) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jefferson Parish Public School Board on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Wilson, Whitney) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jefferson Parish Public School Board (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7946897) filed by Raychell Richard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Whitney Morgan Wilson added to party Raychell Richard(pty:pla).(Wilson, Whitney) Modified on 11/13/2019 (clw). SERVICE WILL BE ACCOMPLISHED THROUGH WAIVER (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.