This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2023 at 15:55:34 (UTC).

Richard Dahler et al v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Richard Dahler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Dahler

Roy Eriksen

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Gregory Sogoyan

Defendant Attorney

Madeleine Messinger

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34712425 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Richard Dahler(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Roy Eriksen(pty:pla))(Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#4

(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

5 #1

CV-11C

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Interest, #2 Notice of Apperance)(Attorney Madeleine Messinger added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Messinger, Madeleine) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

8 #1

Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Interest

8 #2

Notice of Apperance

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-00160 SB(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#11

(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 28, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by April 18, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-00160 SB(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Interest, #2 Notice of Apperance)(Attorney Madeleine Messinger added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Messinger, Madeleine) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34712425 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Richard Dahler, Roy Eriksen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Richard Dahler(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Roy Eriksen(pty:pla))(Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less