This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 07:59:32 (UTC).

Rich v. Putnam County, Tennessee

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Rich filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Putnam County, Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Rich

Defendant

Putnam County, Tennessee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

N. Chase Teeples

Attorney at Yezbak Law Offices

2002 Richard Jones Road, Suite B-200

Nashville, TN 37215

Gregory K. McGillivary

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Hillary D. LeBeau

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Charles P. Yezbak, III

Attorney at Yezbak Law Offices

2002 Richard Jones Road, Suite B-200

Nashville, TN 37215

John Welling Stewart

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Jerome D. Pinn

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900, P O Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37902-2231

Brent A. Morris

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Nashville)

214 Second Avenue, N, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

Fredrick J. Bissinger

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Nashville)

214 Second Avenue, N, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

Edward H. Trent

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900, P O Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37902-2231

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#18

#17

#16

#15

#7

#6

5 #1

Attachment GKM COGS

#5

4 #1

Attachment HDL COGS

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Terry Rich Consent Form

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: The #20 motion to reschedule the initial case management conference is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for October 28, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 774, Nashville, Tennessee. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order by no later than three days before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/4/2019. (mg) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Putnam County, Tennessee.(Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Terry Rich. (Stewart, John) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Putnam County, Tennessee; answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/9/2019. (mg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Putnam County, Tennessee. (Morris, Brent) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ***DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons served on Putnam County, TN on 08/02/2019, filed by Terry Rich. (Yezbak, Charles) Modified on 8/9/2019 (mg). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent A. Morris, Fredrick J. Bissinger, Edward H. Trent, and Jerome D. Pinn. (mg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome D. Pinn on behalf of Putnam County, Tennessee (Morris, Brent) Modified on 8/8/2019 (mg). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward H. Trent on behalf of Putnam County, Tennessee (Morris, Brent) Modified on 8/8/2019 (mg). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/19/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for attorney John W. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2955059) by Terry Rich. (Teeples, N.) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for attorney Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2955047) by Terry Rich. (Attachments: #1 Attachment GKM COGS)(Teeples, N.) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for attorney Hillary D. LeBeau to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2955045) by Terry Rich. (Attachments: #1 Attachment HDL COGS)(Teeples, N.) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 2:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons issued as to Putnam County, Tennessee. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gregory K. McGillivary, Hillary D. LeBeau: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/8/2019. (jw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles P. Yezbak, III and N. Chase Teeples; DC Bar status verified as active for Gregory K. McGillivary and Hillary D. LeBeau. (jw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Putnam County, Tennessee (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2954264), filed by Terry Rich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Terry Rich Consent Form)(jw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Putnam County, Tennessee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer N. Chase Teeples

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hillary D LeBeau

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Welling Stewart