This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:36:18 (UTC).

Rich v. Glatz et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Rich filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Glatz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wiley Y. Daniel and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Wiley Y. Daniel

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audrey Rich

Defendants

Anita Glatz

Anita (I) M. Glatz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Adam Wartell

Attorney at Keating Wagner Polidori & Free, P.C.

1290 Broadway, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80203

Teresa Marie Abel

Attorney at Keating Wagner Polidori & Free, P.C.

1290 Broadway, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Oszczakiewicz

Attorney at Garfield & Hecht PC-Aspen

625 East Hyman Avenue, Suite 201

Aspen, CO 81601

Christopher David Bryan

Attorney at Garfield & Hecht PC-Aspen

625 East Hyman Avenue, Suite 201

Aspen, CO 81601

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa Marie Abel on behalf of Audrey RichAttorney Teresa Marie Abel added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla) (Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Anita Glatz by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

8 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Audrey Rich. Anita Glatz waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Wartell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher David Bryan on behalf of Anita Glatz, Anita (I) M. GlatzAttorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita Glatz(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita (I) M. Glatz(pty:dft) (Bryan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Anita (I) M. Glatz. (Bryan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Anita (I) M. Glatz. (Bryan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#21

(#21) MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Anita (I) M. Glatz by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/18/2019. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/1/2019. (mdave, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/04/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Audrey Rich All parties consent.. (Wartell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/30/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa Marie Abel on behalf of Audrey RichAttorney Teresa Marie Abel added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla) (Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Anita (I) M. Glatz by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/18/2019. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/1/2019. (mdave, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#20) ORDER VACATING previous Order granting extension of time (Doc. 19). The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge (See Doc. 16). SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/18/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Court has reviewed the motion. Good cause being shown, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants response to the Complaint is due on or before August 1, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/17/2019. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Anita (I) M. Glatz. (Bryan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/04/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Audrey Rich All parties consent.. (Wartell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/30/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #13 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Audrey Rich.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/29/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#12) This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico upon his appointment and the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01047-DDD. Text only entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher David Bryan on behalf of Anita Glatz, Anita (I) M. GlatzAttorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita Glatz(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita (I) M. Glatz(pty:dft) (Bryan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Audrey Rich. Anita Glatz waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Wartell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Anita Glatz by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa Marie Abel on behalf of Audrey RichAttorney Teresa Marie Abel added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla) (Abel, Teresa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/10/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Audrey Rich (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6626541)Attorney Daniel Adam Wartell added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla), filed by Audrey Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wartell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.