This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 07:25:56 (UTC).

Rice v. Vandergriff et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Rice filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Vandergriff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rice

Defendants

David L. Vandergriff

CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shea W. Conley

Defendant Attorney

John M. Dunn

 

Court Documents

doc

Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith added. Judge Danny C. Reeves no longer assigned to case. (ECO) (ECO). (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff notice consent and reference of civil action to a magistrate judge (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER: 1. The defendants' partial motion to dismiss [Record No. #7 ] is DENIED, as moot. 2. The parties' proposed agreed order to dismiss Counts 2 and 3, without prejudice, docketed as a motion [Record No. #9 ], is GRANTED. 3. The parties may execute and file the appropriate consent form no later than Friday, March 24, 2023. Failure to do will result in the entry of a scheduling order and this matter will proceed before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/17/2023.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#10

(#10) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#9

(#9) Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Count II and Count III of the Complaint by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Court's Order to Show Cause #5 filed by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff. (Dunn, John) Modified to create link to Order on 3/6/2023 (ECO). (Entered: 03/03/2023)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, John) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

6 #1

Notice, Consent to Magistrate Judge

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from this date, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than fourteen (14) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. In proposing deadlines, the parties should contemplate a trial date within 12 months or fewer. The parties' report shall include the following information: (a) the parties' views and proposals required by Rule 26(f); (b) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to join other parties and to amend the pleadings; (c) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to file motions; (d) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to complete all pretrial discovery, including expert witness discovery; (e) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary for the parties to make the expert disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(2), with these disclosures to be made during the pretrial discovery phase of the case; (f) the probable length of trial and whether there will be issues to submit to a jury; (g) the dates that are mutually convenient with counsel to assign this case for trial; (h) whether the parties desire a scheduling conference before entry of a scheduling order; and (i) whether the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge for all further proceedings, including trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are attached to this order and forms signed by all parties counsel should be filed by no later than the date counsels joint status report is due. If all parties, by counsel, so consent, the Clerk of Court shall re-assign this matter to the appropriate Magistrate Judge without the necessity of further order of the Court. L.R. 73.1(c). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent to Magistrate Judge)(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER: that, on or before Friday, March 3, 2023, the defendants are directed to SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be remanded to state court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/23/2023.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Rice. (Conley, Shea) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc.. (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

1 #4

Exhibit C-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit B-State Court Answer

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #12 Notice by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff notice consent and reference of civil action to a magistrate judge (ECO) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Candace J. Smith added. Judge Danny C. Reeves no longer assigned to case. (ECO) (ECO). (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff notice consent and reference of civil action to a magistrate judge (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (ECO) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: 1. The defendants' partial motion to dismiss [Record No. #7 ] is DENIED, as moot. 2. The parties' proposed agreed order to dismiss Counts 2 and 3, without prejudice, docketed as a motion [Record No. #9 ], is GRANTED. 3. The parties may execute and file the appropriate consent form no later than Friday, March 24, 2023. Failure to do will result in the entry of a scheduling order and this matter will proceed before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/17/2023.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Count II and Count III of the Complaint by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #8 RESPONSE re #5 Order (ECO) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Court's Order to Show Cause #5 filed by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff. (Dunn, John) Modified to create link to Order on 3/6/2023 (ECO). (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, John) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from this date, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than fourteen (14) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. In proposing deadlines, the parties should contemplate a trial date within 12 months or fewer. The parties' report shall include the following information: (a) the parties' views and proposals required by Rule 26(f); (b) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to join other parties and to amend the pleadings; (c) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to file motions; (d) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to complete all pretrial discovery, including expert witness discovery; (e) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary for the parties to make the expert disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(2), with these disclosures to be made during the pretrial discovery phase of the case; (f) the probable length of trial and whether there will be issues to submit to a jury; (g) the dates that are mutually convenient with counsel to assign this case for trial; (h) whether the parties desire a scheduling conference before entry of a scheduling order; and (i) whether the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge for all further proceedings, including trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are attached to this order and forms signed by all parties counsel should be filed by no later than the date counsels joint status report is due. If all parties, by counsel, so consent, the Clerk of Court shall re-assign this matter to the appropriate Magistrate Judge without the necessity of further order of the Court. L.R. 73.1(c). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent to Magistrate Judge)(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: that, on or before Friday, March 3, 2023, the defendants are directed to SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be remanded to state court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/23/2023.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Rice. (Conley, Shea) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: Answer to Complaint (part of State Court Record Exhibit B of Notice of Removal) (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., David L. Vandergriff. (Filed as part of State Court Record (Attachment 3-Exhibit B-State Court Answer). (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc.. (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00219. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5486359), filed by David L. Vandergriff, CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less