This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:05:34 (UTC).

Rice v. Paccar, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Rice filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Paccar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Rice

Defendants

Paccar Winch, Inc.

Paccar, Inc.

Paccar, Inc. doing business as Braden Winch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amber L. Hurst

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brandon Douglas Roberts

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark Hammons

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Samanthia S. Marshall

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

W. Kirk Turner

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Defendant's Consent Form

16 #1

Plaintiff's Consent Form

#16

15 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 1/17/2020 at 10:45 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent PACCAR Inc for Paccar Winch, Inc.) by Paccar Winch, Inc. (Turner, W.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paccar, Inc. (Turner, W.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Paccar Winch, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (Turner, W.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Samanthia S. Marshall on behalf of Paccar Winch, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (Marshall, Samanthia) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. Kirk Turner on behalf of Paccar Winch, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (Turner, W.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Paccar, Inc. - Served on 12/2/2019. by Jeffrey Rice (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Jeffrey Rice (Roberts, Brandon) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Jeffrey Rice (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Jeffrey Rice (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Paccar Winch, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Paccar, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/14/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1317761 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jeffrey Rice (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/21/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Paccar Winch, Inc., Paccar, Inc. by Jeffrey Rice (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffrey Rice (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paccar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Hammons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon D Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Hurst