This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:19:02 (UTC).

Rice v. Ecolab Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Rice filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ecolab Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01183

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antwon Rice

Defendants

Ecolab, Inc.

Does 1-100 inclusive

Ecolab Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy J Becker

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar St, Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Richard Dale McCune, Jr

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 92612

Jacob Robert Rusch

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Tuan Q. Nguyen

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 92612

Michele M Vercoski

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tuan Q. Nguyen on behalf of Antwon Rice. (Nguyen, Tuan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antwon Rice. Ecolab Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M Vercoski on behalf of Antwon Rice. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Does, Ecolab Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-100 inclusive, Ecolab, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7726989) filed by Antwon Rice. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Becker, Timothy) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tuan Q. Nguyen on behalf of Antwon Rice. (Nguyen, Tuan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dale McCune, Jr on behalf of Antwon Rice. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antwon Rice. Ecolab Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M Vercoski on behalf of Antwon Rice. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michele M. Vercoski, Richard D. McCune, Tuan Q. Nguyen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Does, Ecolab Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1183 SRN/ECW. (CLK) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-100 inclusive, Ecolab, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7726989) filed by Antwon Rice. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Becker, Timothy) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less