This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2019 at 08:25:53 (UTC).

Rice v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Rice filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02733

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonard R Rice

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Lani D. Lester

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Ashley Crowell

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP - PHOENIX, AZ

2425 E. Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Charles Silvestri Higgins

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, P.A.

2575 E. Camelback Rd, Ste 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Shane Gibson Ramsey

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

150 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Dell P Chappell

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

1320 Main St., 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Eric Alfred Paine

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) STIPULATION of Mediator by Leonard R Rice. (Higgins, Charles) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER GRANTING MOTION #26 FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 19-2733. (shl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#26

(#26) MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Leonard R Rice. (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#25

(#25) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, March 15, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

22 #1

Exhibit A - G

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Leonard R Rice re #18 Status Report Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G)(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#18

(#19) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #18 Status Report filed by Leonard R Rice has been filed. For future reference, please note Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/30/2019. (Claxton, Charmiane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/30/2019. (Claxton, Charmiane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15668234 filed by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) STIPULATION of Mediator by Leonard R Rice. (Higgins, Charles) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER GRANTING MOTION #26 FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 19-2733. (shl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Leonard R Rice. (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, March 15, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • (#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/11/2019. On the phone were Ashley Crowell and Paul L. Stoller for the plaintiff. Present in court were Lani D. Lester for the plaintiff and Dell P. Chapell for the defendant. The court discussed dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, March 15, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Leonard R Rice re #18 Status Report Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G)(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**.] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/6/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3232104) by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Crowell, Ashley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #18 Status Report filed by Leonard R Rice has been filed. For future reference, please note Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/30/2019. (Claxton, Charmiane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • (#2) Member Case CV-18-2037-PHX-DGC has been consolidated into Lead Case MDL-2641 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15668234 filed by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Silvestri Higgins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Crowell