This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:39:03 (UTC).

Ribelin Cook v. Harris County et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 Ribelin Cook filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Harris County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01495

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa L. Ribelin Cook

Defendants

Harris County

Bryan Vaclavik

John Brewer

Kim Ogg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Durrschmidt

Defendant Attorney

John Allen Douglas

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION for Reconsideration by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

20 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#20

(#20) MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Memorandum and Order, by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Argeroplos, Victoria) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#18

(#18) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #17 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#19

(#19) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marissa Wallace for Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2019 before Judge Keith Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, On the Basis of The Younger Abstention Doctrine, and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Plea for Injunctive Relief. This case is DISMISSED. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit

4 #3

Summon

3 #3

Unredacted attachment

3 #2

Unredacted attachment

3 #1

Unredacted attachment

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Brewer, Harris County, Kim Ogg, Bryan Vaclavik, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order

1 #1

Exhibit A-H

#1

(#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, On the Basis of The Younger Abstention Doctrine, and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Plea for Injunctive Relief. This case is DISMISSED. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Reconsideration by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Memorandum and Order, by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Argeroplos, Victoria) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #17 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marissa Wallace for Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2019 before Judge Keith Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/19 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party Marissa Wallace. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2019, filed. (halcaraz, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, On the Basis of The Younger Abstention Doctrine, and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Plea for Injunctive Relief. This case is DISMISSED. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #10 Brief Regarding Privilege and Privacy, filed by John Brewer, Harris County, Kim Ogg, Bryan Vaclavik. (Douglas, John) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michael J. Durrschnidt for Transcript of 05/01/2019. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michael J. Durrschnidt for Transcript of 04/29/2019. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 7/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, On the Basis of The Younger Abstention Doctrine, and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Plea for Injunctive Relief filed by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed.(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 4/29/2019. Argument heard on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. #1 Defendants' witness Bryan Scott Vaclavik testified. The parties will report back to the Court on the proposed compromise. Motion hearing set for 5/1/2019 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 3A. Appearances:Tom Berg, Scott Duffee. John Allen Douglas, Michael J Durrschmidt.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, On the Basis of The Younger Abstention Doctrine, and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Plea for Injunctive Relief by John Brewer, Harris County, Kim Ogg, Bryan Vaclavik, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Douglas, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Certificate of Notice by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Setting as to #1 Complaint,. Parties notified. TRO Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Brewer, Harris County, Kim Ogg, Bryan Vaclavik, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Brewer, Harris County, Kim Ogg, Bryan Vaclavik (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22298470) filed by Teresa L. Ribelin Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order)(Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less