This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2019 at 07:20:14 (UTC).

RIBBING v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 RIBBING filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are HOPE T CANNON and ROGER VINSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03337

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

Presiding Judge

ROGER VINSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICK A RIBBING

Pensacola, FL 32503

ANTHONY LEE LINER

Pensacola, FL 32503

Defendants

PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT

STATE OF FLORIDA

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE

CITY OF PENSACOLA

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to PATRICK A RIBBING Re: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. That the clerk close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/8/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order to Show Cause. (no response filed) (sdw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to PATRICK A RIBBING Re: #5 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Plaintiff shall show cause, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, why his case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or to follow an order of the Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/23/2019. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order. (no filing fee/IFP motion received) (sdw) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket**Duplicate - ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/4/2019. (erl) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for non-prisoners). Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a complete second motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400 filing fee. (IFP motion/Fee due by 9/18/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/4/2019. (form to Pla) (sdw) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se litigant PATRICK A RIBBING. (sdw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICK A RIBBING. (sdw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, CITY OF PENSACOLA, PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT, and STATE OF FLORIDA filed by PATRICK A RIBBING. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chamber of Commerce of USA is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant