This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:27:24 (UTC).

Rhonda Q. Hart et al v. LA County DCFS et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Rhonda Q Hart filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LA County DCFS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09974

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rhonda Q. Hart

Defendants

County of Los Angeles

Lauren Perry

Brittany Hendrickson-Arlington

Michael Morrison

Does 1-40

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carol A Baidas

Attorney at Law Offices of Vincent Davis and Associates

440 East Huntington Suite 100

Arcadia, CA 91006

Vincent Walter Davis

Attorney at Law Officies of Vincent Davis and Associates

440 East Huntington Drive Suite 100

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant Attorneys

Leonard E Torres

Attorney at Torres and Brenner

301 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 614

Pasadena, CA 91101

Anita S Brenner

Attorney at Torres and Brenner

301 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 614

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

1 #44

Exhibit 44-minute order

1 #41

Exhibit 41-NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

1 #37

Exhibit 37-Plft Motion for leave to file FAC

1 #35

Exhibit 35-Notice of non-opp. to motion for judgment on the pleadings

1 #32

Exhibit 32-Minute order re continuance

1 #30

Exhibit 30-Minute order re CMC and Lancaster Demurrer

1 #26

Exhibit 26-Substitution of Attorney

1 #25

Exhibit 25-Def LSD Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer

1 #24

Exhibit 24-Notice of Continuance of Hearing

1 #20

Exhibit 20-County's Motion for Judgment on the Pldgs

1 #18

Exhibit 18-Lancaster Case Management Conference Stmt (served 5.24.21)

1 #16

Exhibit 16- DEMURRER BY LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT

1 #15

Exhibit 15-County's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

1 #14

Exhibit 14-Answer to Complaint by County

1 #9

Exhibit 9-Notice and Acknowledgment of receipt-civil-Lancaster School District

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#20) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [Supplement to ECF 19] ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.. (Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#19) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart.. (Davis, Vincent) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#18) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST REQUEST for Leave of Carol A. Baidas #16 . Counsel- please stop filing this type of request. Until further notice, ALL hearings are by zoom. (lom) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave of Carol A. Baidas to Appear for Hearing via Zoom Video Conference on March 7, 2022 #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket(#16) STRICKEN, see docket entry no 18 - REQUEST for Leave of Carol A. Baidas to Appear for Hearing via Zoom Video Conference on March 7, 2022 filed by Rhonda Hart Rhonda Q. Hart. Request set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Davis, Vincent) Modified on 2/17/2022 (lom). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-09974 ODW(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE COUNSEL ANITA SUSAN BRENNER'S REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE OR TELEPHONICALLY RE THE MARCH 7, 2022 1:30PM SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #11 , REQUEST for Leave of Anita Susan Brenner to Appear for at Hearing via Zoom Video Conference or Telephonically on March 7, 2022 #10 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave of Anita Susan Brenner to Appear for at Hearing via Zoom Video Conference or Telephonically on March 7, 2022 #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Missing proposed order. As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order and or proposed judgment are submitted as their own s Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants County of Los Angeles, Does 1-40, Brittany Hendrickson-Arlington, Lancaster School District, Michael Morrison, Lauren Perry amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/27/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart, upon Defendant Lancaster School District acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Iris Ramirez, Attorney for defendant Lancaster School District. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart, upon Defendant Lancaster School District served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lancaster School District, Attn: Administration, 44711 Cedar Avenue, Lancaster, CA 92534 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart, upon Defendant Lancaster School District served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lancaster School District, 44711 Cedar Avenue, Lancaster, CA 92534 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT 4/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILE COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants LA County DCFS, LA County Board of Supervisor, Lancaster School District., filed by plaintiff Rhonda Q. Hart. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/28/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Leonard E Torres counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Leonard E. Torres as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Leonard E Torres added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Torres, Leonard) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles, identifying Rhonda Q. Hart, County of Los Angeles, Lancaster School District, Lauren Perry, Brittany Hendrickson-Arlington, Michael Morrison. (Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant LA County Board of Supervisor, Defendant LA County DCFS. (Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV03481 Receipt No: ACACDC-32540670 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants LA County Board of Supervisor, LA County DCFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Exhibit 3-Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), #4 Exhibit 4-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5-Notice of case assignment, #6 Exhibit 6-Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit 7-POS-Board of Supervisors, #8 Exhibit 8-DUMONT DECL. PURSUANT TO 430.41(a), #9 Exhibit 9-Notice and Acknowledgment of receipt-civil-Lancaster School District, #10 Exhibit 10-POS-Lancaster School District, #11 Exhibit 11-POS-Lancaster School District-attn Administration, #12 Exhibit 12-POS-Notice and Acknowledgment of receipt, #13 Exhibit 13-Pltf's Case Management Stmt, #14 Exhibit 14-Answer to Complaint by County, #15 Exhibit 15-County's Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #16 Exhibit 16- DEMURRER BY LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT, #17 Exhibit 17-County's Case Management Stmt, #18 Exhibit 18-Lancaster Case Management Conference Stmt (served 5.24.21), #19 Exhibit 19-Lancaster Notice of Posting Jury Fees (served 5.24.21), #20 Exhibit 20-County's Motion for Judgment on the Pldgs, #21 Exhibit 21-Proposed Order re Motion for Judgment on the Pldgs, #22 Exhibit 22-Notice of Association of Counsel, #23 Exhibit 23-Notice re continuance of hearing and order, #24 Exhibit 24-Notice of Continuance of Hearing, #25 Exhibit 25-Def LSD Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer, #26 Exhibit 26-Substitution of Attorney, #27 Exhibit 27-LANCASTER MTC SROGS SET 1, #28 Exhibit 28-LANCASTER MTC NTP SET 1, #29 Exhibit 29-LANCASTER MTC-FROG, #30 Exhibit 30-Minute order re CMC and Lancaster Demurrer, #31 Exhibit 31-Notice of Case Reassignment and order, #32 Exhibit 32-Minute order re continuance, #33 Exhibit 33-Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order re Continuance, #34 Exhibit 34-Notice re continuance of hearing and order, #35 Exhibit 35-Notice of non-opp. to motion for judgment on the pleadings, #36 Exhibit 36-Suppl. Proof of Electronic service, #37 Exhibit 37-Plft Motion for leave to file FAC, #38 Exhibit 38-Notice of Ruling re Motion for Jmt on Pleadings, #39 Exhibit 39-Ruling on Submitted matter, #40 Exhibit 40-Cert mailing Ruling on Submitted matter, #41 Exhibit 41-NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, #42 Exhibit 42-POS OF FAC, #43 Exhibit 43-HART DISMISSAL, #44 Exhibit 44-minute order, #45 Exhibit 45-HART FAC FILED) (Attorney Anita S Brenner added to party LA County Board of Supervisor(pty:bkmov), Attorney Anita S Brenner added to party LA County DCFS(pty:dft))(Brenner, Anita) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard E Torres